Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Adult Traffic case against Alexander, Theresa Lee, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Lucena, Kristen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLucena, Kristen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2002 |
CategoryAdult Traffic |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Case Cycle Time89 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAC | |
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: AJA | |
August 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Desc: ARRAIGNMENT Desc2: **NOT ORDERED TO APPEAR ON THIS CASE** Disp Code: 712 - PLED NOLO; WAIVED TIME, SENTENCED Disp Clerk: AS Filing Clerk: AMK Judge: Lucena, Kristen A |
|
August 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Collections - Returned from Butte County Central Collections CASE RETURNED FROM CENTRAL COLLECTIONS PER COURT ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLC |
|
November 20, 2003 | Docket Event |
Collections - Referred to Butte County Central Collections CASE REFERRED TO CENTRAL COLLECTIONS |
|
September 22, 2003 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information ADDED $250 CIVIL ASSESS-1214.1 PC (MCDE3/D99) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ZFP |
|
September 02, 2003 | Docket Event |
Complaint FTP PURS 40508(b) COMPL FILED; (MCW03) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ZFP |
|
April 07, 2003 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information A/ABST TO DMV: DE1 CONV CODES (C ) [MCDE1] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ZCV |
|
March 18, 2003 | Docket Event |
Payment Plan PAYMENT AGREEMENT FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CWS |
|
March 18, 2003 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Desc: TRAFFIC ARRAIGNMENT - EXTENSION GRANTED Desc2: ADD ADMIN FEE Disp Code: 934 - PLED G/NOLO-PAYMENT PLAN ESTABLISHED Disp Clerk: CWS Filing Clerk: AHM Judge: Other, Tickler |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.