Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sumiyasu Jill, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Makupson Carolyn Annette, against Sumiyasu Kazuhiro, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 19, 2011 |
CategoryLegal Separation W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions223 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time363 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (-Qualified Domestic Relations Order ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (-Qualified Domestic Relations Order ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request (Certified - On Behalf of: Respondent: Sumiyasu, Kazuhiro ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request (Certified - On Behalf of: Respondent: Sumiyasu, Kazuhiro ) Filed by Respondent |
|
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sumiyasu, Jill ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sumiyasu, Jill ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sumiyasu, Jill - Filed and Entered on 2014-02-21 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sumiyasu, Jill ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.