Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tu Billy, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Office Of Louis P. Dell, against Westlake Services Llc, Molino Anthony A. Law Offices Of, Chevrolet Camino Real, Camino Real Chevrolet, Booth Llp, (total of 5) See All represented by Molino Anthony A. Law Offices Of, Booth Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with C. Edward Simpson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeC. Edward Simpson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2013 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Disposition Type |
Case Cycle Time105 days |
Motion for an Order
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF HRG )
Date: 2013-04-10T00:00:00Notice (of lodging federal authorities in support of petition )
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2013-04-10T00:00:00Response
Date: 2013-03-04T00:00:00Petition (to compel arbitration )
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00Declaration (Billy Tu )
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2013-04-10 00:00:00
Date: 2013-04-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to motion )
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-01-15T00:00:00Opposition (demurrer )
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Response (in opposition to petition )
Date: 2013-03-04T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00Motion for an Order (to reclassify action )
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Opposition (motion )
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to demurrer )
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord
Date: 2013-04-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2013-04-30 00:00:00
Date: April 30, 2013Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-04-23T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to petition to compel )
Date: April 25, 2013Reply to Opposition
Date: 2013-04-25T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record
Date: May 02, 2013Minute order entered: 2013-04-16 00:00:00
Date: 2013-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 06, 2013Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
Date: May 06, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.