Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lerner, Emily filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas K Mann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas K Mann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order Appointing Guardian Filed
Date: January 12, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: December 13, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: September 08, 2021Letters Issued - Person
Date: January 12, 2022Petition and Party Information Entered (Guardianship)
Date: April 20, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: April 20, 2021Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: April 20, 2021Duties of Guardian Form filed
Date: April 20, 2021Consent of Guardian
Date: April 20, 2021Declaration Under UCCJEA filed
Date: April 20, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 20, 2021Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: April 27, 2021Temporary Letters Issued
Date: April 27, 2021Temporary Letters Issued
Date: June 22, 2021Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed
Date: September 22, 2021Request Filed Re:
Date: October 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Claim Fwd to Fin & Adm Off/Indigent Defense for Payment in the amount of $1600.00 |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Claim Received, Verified and Forwarded to Dept S35 |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Appointed Attorney Claim Received from Emily Lerner in the amount of $1600.00 for 09/22/1 to 01/12/22 |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian Filed | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued - Person | |
January 12, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing on Petition for Appointment of Guardian Judicial Officer Reichert, Stanford E Hearing Time 11:00 AM | |
January 12, 2022 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remove Attorney from Case EMILY LERNER |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Signed | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.