Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Conv filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilleece, Michelle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilleece, Michelle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: April 13, 2021Temporary Letters Issued
Date: May 13, 2021Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Referral to Family Court Services Filed
Date: May 13, 2021Letters Issued - Person
Date: August 31, 2021Petition and Party Information Entered (Guardianship)
Date: April 06, 2021Declaration Under UCCJEA filed
Date: April 06, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Request to Excuse Notice with Due Diligence Dec Filed
Date: April 13, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: April 13, 2021Consent of Guardian
Date: April 06, 2021Duties of Guardian Form filed
Date: April 06, 2021Temporary Letters Issued
Date: April 13, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: May 07, 2021Order Appointing Guardian Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: May 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 |
Department V12 - Victorville
Judge: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice |
||
November 09, 2023 |
Department F3 - Fontana
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address for Party Filed | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service NTC OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS RE:MTN TO APPOINT GUARDIAN |
|
October 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): DOCUMENT ALREADY FILED AT THE PROBATE CLERK'S OFFICE PUBLIC WINDOW ON 10/12/2023. |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed Re: TO APPOINT GUARDIAN OF ESTATE |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Received NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN OF ESTATE OF MINOR AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees Filed FOR MINOR NATALYA JADE ROBINSON |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk AS TO MINOR NATALYA JADE ROBINSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.