Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Braga, Genniva filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michelle Gilleece presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Gilleece Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Exhibits List Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: April 07, 2022Order Appointing Guardian Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Subpoenas Destroyed | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Filed | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Received - FAX: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY OF RECORD |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibits List Filed AMENDED |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Filed NO BOND REQ |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued - Person | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST VIA ELECTRONIC SERVICE AS TO GENNIVA LE BARAGA AND QUANG PETER HUYNH |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice Filed | |
June 01, 2022 |
Department S36 - SBJC
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.