Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Betchart, Joe C., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Keith H. Fudenna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeith H. Fudenna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2007 |
CategoryProbate-Will & Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time421 days |
Probate Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2007-04-13T00:00:00Inventory and Appraisal - final Filed
Date: 2007-07-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous document Filed
Date: 2007-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2007-03-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Executor Joe C. Betchart Filed
Date: 2007-04-13T00:00:00Declaration of Herman A. Trutner Filed
Date: 2007-02-27T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2007-03-06T00:00:00Probate Examiner's Check List for ptn for probate for 4/13/07 hearing Filed
Date: 2007-04-06T00:00:00Letters of Testamentary Filed
Date: 2007-04-13T00:00:00Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Filed
Date: 2007-02-27T00:00:00Petition for Final Distribution upon waiver og acctg. Filed by Joe C. Betchart
Date: 2007-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Joe C. Betchart
Date: September 13, 2007Proof of Publication As to Joe C. Betchart Filed
Date: 2007-04-04T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: September 13, 2007Probate Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: November 09, 2007Order Approving Final Distribution - Waiver of Accounting Filed
Date: November 09, 2007Receipt on Distribution by Party Filed
Date: November 29, 2007For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.