Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2004 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2021 |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Probate Examiner's Check List PETITION TO APPOINT CONSERVATOR Filed
Date: 2005-02-08T00:00:00Probate Examiner's Check List FOR 6/24/2005 Filed
Date: June 16, 2005Probate Examiner's Check List Petition to Appoint Conservator Filed
Date: 2004-11-24T00:00:00Probate Examiner's Check List PETITION TO APPOINT CONSERVATOR Filed
Date: 2005-01-21T00:00:00Probate Examiner's Check List PETITION TO APPOINT CONSERVATOR Filed
Date: 2004-10-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.