Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Edward Copeland, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Marites Copeland, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Joni T. Hiramoto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoni T. Hiramoto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 1991 |
CategoryPetn For Dissolution |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: MINUTES AND ORDER SERVED ON EDWARD COPELAND ON 11/17/17 Not Applicable |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON DCSS MTN/OSC TO/FOR TO DETERMINE ARREARS DURING INCARCERATION ( MARITES COPELAND) - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
MINUTES AND ORDER AFTER 11/09/17 HEARING FILED Not Applicable |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 02 TO 32. Not Applicable Judge: Joni T. Hiramoto |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: MINUTES AND ORDER SERVED ON EDWARD COPELAND ON 09/28/17 Not Applicable Judge: Judith S. Craddick |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF MINUTES AND ORDER ON MARITES COPELAND FILED. SERVED ON 09/21/17 Not Applicable Judge: Judith S. Craddick |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON DCSS MTN/OSC TO/FOR TO DETERMINE ARREARS DURING INCARCERATION ( MARITES COPELAND) - Minutes Complete |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
MINUTES AND ORDER AFTER 09/21/17 HEARING FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: REQUEST FOR ORDER SERVED ON EDWARD COPELAND ON 08/23/17 Not Applicable Judge: John William Kennedy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.