Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dionesia Lazaro, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cesar Lazaro, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Wendy McGuire Coats presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy McGuire Coats Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Without Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2026 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/30/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17
Judge: Wendy McGuire Coats |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/28/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17
Judge: Wendy McGuire Coats |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 12/30/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17
Judge: Wendy McGuire Coats |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/28/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17
Judge: Wendy McGuire Coats |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 12/29/26 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17
Judge: Wendy McGuire Coats |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.