Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Myra Beth Safo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Matthew Mehran Heghiri, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Wendy McGuire Coats presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy McGuire Coats Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Without Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2026 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 12/28/26 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17
Judge: Wendy McGuire Coats |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/27/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17
Judge: Wendy McGuire Coats |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17
Judge: Wendy McGuire Coats |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 12/28/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17
Judge: Wendy McGuire Coats |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/26/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17
Judge: Wendy McGuire Coats |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.