Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Francisco Javier Navarro Cervantes filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Brian F. Haynes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian F. Haynes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS) FILED. EXPIRES ON 11/08/24; PROTECTED PARTY IS HUMBERTO NAVARRO Not Applicable Judge: Brian F. Haynes |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L OSC/TRO RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY HUMBERTO NAVARRO - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L OSC/TRO RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY HUMBERTO NAVARRO - Minutes GRANTED |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING ON F/L OSC/TRO RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY HUMBERTO NAVARRO - Minutes | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON FRANCISCO JAVIER NAVARRO CERVANTES FILED. SERVED ON 11/01/21 Not Applicable Judge: Brian F. Haynes |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L OSC/TRO RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY HUMBERTO NAVARRO - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING FILED ***TRO EFFECTIVE Not Applicable |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
5DVR CALENDARED ON 10/18/21 IN DEPT. RICH. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 10/18/21 IN DEPT. 34. Not Applicable Judge: Julia Campins |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC/TRO D.V. WAS SET FOR 10/18/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. RICH | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
UPDATE DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 09/24/2021 OF HUMBERTO NAVARRO Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.