Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Barbara A Miller, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sun Power Corp. 401, Kent J Miller, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Trevor S. White presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrevor S. White Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1037 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
WAGE & EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT ORDER FILED BY BARBARA A MILLER Not Applicable |
|
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER 11/05/12 HEARING RE: SPOUSAL SUPPORT FILED. Not Applicable |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL ESTIMATED AT 03:00 HOURS. - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
F/L SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO MARK GONZALEZ - Minutes DISCHARGED |
|
September 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED, W/CLERKS CERTIF OF MAIL ATTACHED Not Applicable |
|
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
1/2 DAY COURT REPORTER FEE PAID BY BARBARA A MILLER Not Applicable |
|
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 37 | |
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL ESTIMATED AT 03:00 HOURS. - Minutes Complete |
|
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: I&E, FORMS FOR OTHER PARTY, WITNESS LIST, TRIAL EXHIBITS AND TRIAL BRIEFS, BARBARA ROSSI 082012 Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.