Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
David Bradbury filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2007 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time170 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING TO DAVID BRADBURY ON 7/19/07 Not Applicable |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS) FILED. EXPIRES ON 02/22/08; PROTECTED PARTY IS LOUISE NALL Not Applicable |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L OSC/TRO RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY LOUISE NALL - Minutes GRANTED |
|
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
(F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 01/31/2007 OF LOUISE NALL AS TO DAVID BRADBURY (SERVED ON 02/03/07) Not Applicable |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC/TRO D.V. WAS SET FOR 2/23/07 AT 9:30 IN DEPT. 54 | |
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE IS LAVENDAR Not Applicable |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY LOUISE NALL | |
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER FILED ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO LOUISE NALL IS GRANTED GRANTED |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST AND ORDER FOR FREE SERVICE OF RESTRAINING ORDER FILED Not Applicable |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.