Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Yesenia Maria Sanchez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Victor Mauricio Diaz, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with David E. Goldstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Goldstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution Without Children |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions111 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE RETURNED BY POST OFFICE AS UNDELIVERABLE TO VICTOR ANTEMATE. Not Applicable |
|
June 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
F/L CASE CLASSIFICATION CONFERENCE (PRO PER) - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
June 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
June 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON/FOR 6/27/07 FOR DISSOLUTION FILED WITH PROOF OF MAILING Not Applicable |
|
June 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Not Applicable | |
June 21, 2007 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED. | |
June 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY YESENIA MARIA SANCHEZ Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.