Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Salvador Zamora, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Idania Zamora, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2000 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: NTC RE PYMT OF SPPT FLD 2/14/12 MLD TO IDANIA LAGUNA & SALVADOR ZAMORA ON 3/22/12 Not Applicable |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE FILED DCSS CASE IS NOW CLOSED Not Applicable |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: MINUTES & ORDER FILED 10/26/11 MLD TO IDANIA LAGUNA & SALVADOR ZAMORA ON 12/12/11 Not Applicable |
|
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
MINUTES AND ORDER AFTER 10/26/11 HEARING FILED Not Applicable |
|
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON DCSS MTN/OSC TO/FOR MOD HLTH CARE/SHARING OF HLTH COSTS ( COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA) - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
September 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: NTCE OF MOTION FLD 07/14/11 RESENT TO NEW ADDRESS OF SALVADOR ZAMORA ON 09/01/11 Not Applicable |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: NOTICE OF MOTION FLD 7/14/11 MDL TO IDANIA LAGUNA & SALVADOR ZAMORA ON 8/24/11 Not Applicable |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | DCSS HEARING ON MOTION/OSC WAS SET FOR 10/26/11 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 52 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.