Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Randy Deskin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kathie M. Deskin, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Trevor S. White presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrevor S. White Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1019 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
COPIES Not Applicable |
|
August 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
(2336) FINAL JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
F/L APPEARANCE, STIPULATION AND WAIVERS FILED Not Applicable |
|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 03 TO 37. Not Applicable |
|
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: UNFILED 2336 JUDGMENT Not Applicable |
|
January 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 19 TO 03. Not Applicable |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 07 TO 19. Not Applicable |
|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT FILED BY RANDY DESKIN Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.