Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Yuba, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dcss Attorney Yuba County, against Espana, Omar, represented by Ali, Frank F, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Kim E. McBride Pera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKim E. McBride Pera Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: McBride, Kim E |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.