Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Yuba, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dcss Attorney Yuba County, against Pike, Deven J, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion For Judgement or Modify: Support &/OR Health Care | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Governmental - Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.