Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dcss Attorney Yuba County, against Gallardo, Israel, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Gov - Notice of Motion | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Registration CA Support Order | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Governmental - Statement Registration CA Support Order | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice RE Payment of Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.