Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Colusa, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dcss Attorney Yuba County, against Molina, Jose A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2020 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time124 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Gov - Notice of Motion | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Governmental - Statement Registration CA Support Order | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice RE Payment of Support | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Registration CA Support Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.