Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sutter County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Jacobs, Brandon, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Order - No Fee | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Resp | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Registration CA Support Order | |
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Governmental - Statement Registration CA Support Order | |
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice RE Payment of Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.