Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Swindle, Shanee, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Luster, Christopher M, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2020 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order Cont.
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Resp | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Order/Stipulation for Judge Pro Tem | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order Cont.
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.