Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Diaz, Chantanney, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Nava, Arcelio, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Declaration/Memorandum | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Order/Stipulation for Judge Pro Tem | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.