Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzales, Victoria, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Garcia, Rodrigo, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 02, 2020 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to OSC/Notice Motion | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Resp | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | FL Orientation Completed | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Orientation | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.