Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yabra, Alesha Arlene, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Schmidt, Trenton James, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Order/Stipulation for Judge Pro Tem | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation To Appear
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Status Conference | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Related Cases |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.