Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rivas, Elyssa Tatiana, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Mcbride, Skyler James, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2020 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Order/Stipulation for Judge Pro Tem | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Declaration/Memorandum | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Orientation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.