Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Beet, Daniel Mark, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Rabago, Gemma Louise, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2020 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time72 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.