Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Aguilar, Ilda Irene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Vazquez, Jorge Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Notice of Status/Case Mgmt Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Ptnr | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.