Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Williams, Patricia M., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Williams, Kelly, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelanie K. Bendorf Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time46 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Long Cause Hearing
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order - No Fee | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Return of Documents (Fill-in) | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Transfer In Case Received from | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.