Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Armstrong, Makinzie Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Armstrong, Curtis Al, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Return of Documents (Fill-in) | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: McBride-Pera, Kim E |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Electronic | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Resp |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.