Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Suoja, Sheryl, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Suoja, Rodney, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelanie K. Bendorf Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order - No Fee | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order Cont.
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.