Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alvarado, Pamela Jean, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Alvarado, Ricardo David, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial CT Family Law
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.