Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Reissi, Vida, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Elyasi, Homayoun, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelanie K. Bendorf Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Delivery | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal in Part | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Delivery | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio and/or Video | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report-Recommendation | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Orientation | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | FL Orientation Completed Online |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.