Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mendoza, Cindy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mendoza Ortiz, Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio and/or Video |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.