Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Adams, Rachelle L., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Adams, Glen M., in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte App. for Rest. of Former Name After Jmt. & Order | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation To Appear
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.