Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rasey, Mathew D., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Barker, Tiffany, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time60 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation To Appear
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Notice of Status/Case Mgmt Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Order/Stipulation for Judge Pro Tem | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Resp | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Response - No Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.