Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Adamson, Kristopher, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Adamson, Stormie, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia L. Scrogin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 22, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time76 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order - No Fee | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Long Cause Hearing
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Ptnr | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Resp | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio and/or Video | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.