Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Medina, Candice, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Medina, Blake, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Return of Documents (Fill-in) | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.