Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Weger, Yvette Christine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Weger, Jr, David Wade, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 13, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time82 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation To Appear
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Hearing Instructions | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Property Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.