Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Medina, Alina, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Romero, Jesus, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelanie K. Bendorf Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.