Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Cagle Jr, Joshua Michael, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Bybee, Sarah Grace, represented by Thomas, Richard, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order Cont.
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio and/or Video | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report-Recommendation | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Domestic Return Receipt | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation Orientation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.