Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Angela M, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Bevard, Reba, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Response | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte on Court's Own Motion
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Related Cases | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential Clets Information | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Request Domestic Violence Restraining Order w/o Children |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.