Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Prichard, Jessie, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Adkins, Nathaniel, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Order - No Fee | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing with Children | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Response - No Fee | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Response - No Fee | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.