Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gallardo, Abigail, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case represented by Woods, Mark A, against Ramirez, Joel, represented by Wheeler, Kelsi, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Declaration/Memorandum | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Declaration/Memorandum | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Declaration/Memorandum | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.