Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Green, Taylor Delaine, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case represented by Thomas, Richard, against Black, Conner Lee, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | FL Orientation Completed | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Orientation | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.