Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mosley, Heather Elizabeth, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Mosley, Jacob Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Orientation | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Order RE FTA/Complete Court Ordered CCRC | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | FL Orientation Completed | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Order/Stipulation for Judge Pro Tem | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.