Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cress, Darci, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Cress, Henry, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions17 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time17 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Court | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte on Court's Own Motion
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.