Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brokenshire, Katie, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Herrell, Jr., Michael, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 10, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing with Children | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Long Cause Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | FL Orientation Completed | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Orientation | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | FL Orientation Completed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.