Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mckay, Tess, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Madden, Shawn, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time170 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order Cont.
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | FL - Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order Cont.
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Order - No Fee | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.